TX SB144 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the extension of the expiration of certain parts of the Texas Economic Development Act.
Title
Relating to the extension of the expiration of certain parts of the Texas Economic Development Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Filed |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB778 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Ways & Means
HB1502 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Left pending in committee
HB1502 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB144 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00144I.htm |