TX HB1502 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the extension of the expiration of certain parts of the Texas Economic Development Act.
Title
Relating to the extension of the expiration of certain parts of the Texas Economic Development Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB144 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
HB778 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Ways & Means
HB778 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Ways & Means
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District