TX SB1437 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]


Relating to payment for the use of a highway toll project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to payment for the use of a highway toll project.


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-18HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Transportation
2017-05-09HouseRead first time
2017-05-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-03SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-03SenateRecord vote
2017-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-03SenateRecord vote
2017-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-03SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-01SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-20SenateReferred to Transportation
2017-03-20SenateRead first time
2017-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments