TX SB1437 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the electronic filing of reports of political contributions and expenditures and of personal financial statements by certain officeholders and candidates and the content of those statements; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the electronic filing of reports of political contributions and expenditures and of personal financial statements by certain officeholders and candidates and the content of those statements; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics |
2015-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
Elections
Elections--Campaign Financing
Elections--Candidates
Electronic Information Systems
Ethics
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
POLITICAL CONTRIBUTIONS
State Officers
Elections
Elections--Campaign Financing
Elections--Candidates
Electronic Information Systems
Ethics
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
POLITICAL CONTRIBUTIONS
State Officers