TX SB1414 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to sexual abuse and child molestation training and examination for employees of certain programs for minors held on campuses of institutions of higher education; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to sexual abuse and child molestation training and examination for employees of certain programs for minors held on campuses of institutions of higher education; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-21 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-21 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-20 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Passed | |
2011-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-20 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-16 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-05-02 | Read first time | |
2011-05-02 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Passed | |
2011-04-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-20 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed | |
2011-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
SEXUAL ABUSE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
SEXUAL ABUSE