TX SB1369 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas Real Estate Research Center and the Texas Real Estate Commission.
Title
Relating to the Texas Real Estate Research Center and the Texas Real Estate Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2305 (Same As) 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Subjects
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY
TEXAS REAL ESTATE COMMISSION
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY
TEXAS REAL ESTATE COMMISSION