TX SB1365 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to public school organization, accountability, and fiscal management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public school organization, accountability, and fiscal management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1509 (Y: 111 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-29HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-29SenateRead
2021-05-29SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1509
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-25HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-25HouseAmended 1-Huberty
2021-05-25HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-23HouseRecommitted to committee
2021-05-23HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-23HousePostponed 5/23/21 5:00 PM
2021-05-23HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32
2021-05-23HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Huberty
2021-05-23HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-23HousePostponed 5/23/21 3:15 PM
2021-05-23HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-20HousePostponed 5/21/21 10:00 AM
2021-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-07HouseReported favorably with amendment(s)
2021-05-07HouseAmendment(s) considered in committee
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-07HouseFailed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-06HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-05-06HouseRead first time
2021-05-05HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-05SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-05SenateRecord vote
2021-05-05SenatePassed
2021-05-05SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-05SenateRecord vote
2021-05-05SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-05SenateCo-author authorized
2021-05-04SenateRecord vote
2021-05-04SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04SenateAmended
2021-05-04SenateAmendment(s) offered FA5 Seliger
2021-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04SenateAmended
2021-05-04SenateAmendment(s) offered FA4 Taylor
2021-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04SenateAmended
2021-05-04SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Bettencourt
2021-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04SenateAmended
2021-05-04SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Bettencourt
2021-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04SenateAmended
2021-05-04SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt
2021-05-04SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-04SenateRecord vote
2021-05-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-26SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-10SenateFiled
2021-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3270 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Returned to committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1365
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01365I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01365S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01365E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01365H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01365F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01365S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01365S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01365S2F3.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01365S2F4.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01365S2F5.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01365H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01365I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01365I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01365S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01365S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01365E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01365H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01365H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01365F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-04-F.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-04-F.PDF#page=28
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-05-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1365&RcdVtNo=1509&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=31

Bill Comments 750

feedback