TX SB1365 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-22 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-22 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Effective immediately | |
2017-05-22 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2017-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-11 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-10 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2017-05-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-03 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |