TX SB1331 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to criminal offenses regarding the possession or consumption of alcoholic beverages by a minor and providing alcoholic beverages to a minor.
Title
Relating to criminal offenses regarding the possession or consumption of alcoholic beverages by a minor and providing alcoholic beverages to a minor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Record vote | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-27 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2011-05-26 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-25 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-25 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2011-05-25 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2011-05-25 | Read | |
2011-05-25 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Passed | |
2011-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-20 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-20 | Amended | |
2011-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-16 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-13 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-07 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2011-05-07 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-07 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2011-05-07 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-03 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-05-03 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-03 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-04-29 | Read first time | |
2011-04-20 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-20 | Record vote | |
2011-04-20 | Passed | |
2011-04-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-20 | Record vote | |
2011-04-20 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-20 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-20 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-18 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-18 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-04-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Filed | |
2011-03-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Alcoholism & Drug Abuse
COMMUNITY SERVICE
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
COMMUNITY SERVICE
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety