TX SB1320 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to notice by a governmental entity regarding certain geospatial data products.
Title
Relating to notice by a governmental entity regarding certain geospatial data products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-18 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-18 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Passed | |
2009-04-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-15 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-06 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed | |
2009-03-04 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1677 (Similar To) 2009-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions