TX SB1315 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the determination that certain property is used as an aid or facility incidental to or useful in the operation or development of a port or waterway or in aid of navigation-related commerce for purposes of the application of certain ad valorem tax laws.
Title
Relating to the determination that certain property is used as an aid or facility incidental to or useful in the operation or development of a port or waterway or in aid of navigation-related commerce for purposes of the application of certain ad valorem tax laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1754 (Y: 106 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-23 - House - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal RV#1320 (Y: 135 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1754 (Y: 106 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-23 - House - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal RV#1320 (Y: 135 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-30 | House | Record vote RV#1754 |
2021-05-30 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2021-05-29 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-27 | House | House appoints conferees |
2021-05-27 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1320 |
2021-05-23 | House | Passed as amended |
2021-05-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-23 | House | Amended 1-Martinez Fischer, Lucio, and Davis |
2021-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-28 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions