TX SB1242 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale, storage, transportation, and disposal of scrap or used tires; providing a civil penalty; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the sale, storage, transportation, and disposal of scrap or used tires; providing a civil penalty; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-20 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-05-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2015-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Environment
Environment--Solid Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
TIRES
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
Business & Commerce--General
Environment
Environment--Solid Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
TIRES
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment