TX SB1233 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to controlled substance prescriptions under the Texas Controlled Substances Act; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to controlled substance prescriptions under the Texas Controlled Substances Act; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2174 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Health Care Providers
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
Crimes--Drugs
Health Care Providers
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1233 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01233I.htm |