TX SB1233 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the promotion of efficiencies in and the administration of certain district court and county services and functions.
Title
Relating to the promotion of efficiencies in and the administration of certain district court and county services and functions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-27 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Record vote | |
2011-05-27 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-27 | Read | |
2011-05-27 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-17 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-16 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-16 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-12 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-12 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-02 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-02 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-29 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-21 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-07 | Filed | |
2011-03-07 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Agriculture
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--Finance
County Government--General
Courts
Courts--Juries
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Elections
Elections--Administration
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
TELECONFERENCING
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--Finance
County Government--General
Courts
Courts--Juries
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Elections
Elections--Administration
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
TELECONFERENCING