TX SB1210 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . January 1, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to substitutes for hydrofluorocarbon refrigerants applicable to commercial or residential buildings or construction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to substitutes for hydrofluorocarbon refrigerants applicable to commercial or residential buildings or construction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24 Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . January 1, 2023
2021-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-12 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-12HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-12SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-10SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-10SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#898
2021-05-08HousePassed
2021-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-08HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-28HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-21HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-21HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-21HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-14HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2021-04-14HouseRead first time
2021-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenatePassed
2021-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-09SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-09SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-08SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-31SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-31SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-31SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-09SenateFiled
2021-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3032 (Same As) 2021-04-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1210
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01210I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01210S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01210E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01210H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01210F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01210I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01210I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01210H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01210F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-09-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1210&RcdVtNo=898&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback