TX SB12 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the contributions to and benefits under the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the contributions to and benefits under the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Sponsors

Sen. Joan Huffman [R]Sen. Brian Birdwell [R]Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R]Sen. Donna Campbell [R]
Sen. Peter Flores [R]Sen. Bob Hall [R]Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D]Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]
Sen. Nathan Johnson [D]Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]Sen. Jane Nelson [R]Sen. Robert Nichols [R]
Sen. Angela Paxton [R]Sen. Charles Perry [R]Sen. Beverly Powell [D]Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D]
Sen. Larry Taylor [R]Sen. Kirk Watson [D]Sen. Royce West [D]Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D]
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D]Sen. Jose Menendez [D]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Armando Walle [D]Rep. Alma Allen [D]
Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]
Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]
Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]
Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]
Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Gina Calanni [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]
Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]
Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Art Fierro [D]
Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]
Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]
Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]
Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]
Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]
Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]
Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Christina Morales [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]
Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Candy Noble [R]
Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]
Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]
Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]
Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]
Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Carl Sherman [D]
Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. John Turner [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]
Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. John Wray [R]
Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]

Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#661 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-15SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-14HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-14HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2019-05-14HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-14HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-14HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-10SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-10SenateSenate requests conference committee
2019-05-10SenateSenate refuses to concur
2019-05-10SenateRead
2019-05-10SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-04-26SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-04-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25HouseRecord vote RV#661
2019-04-25HousePassed
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-25HouseRules suspended
2019-04-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-04-24HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 9
2019-04-16HousePostponed 4/25/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-02HousePosting rule suspended
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2019-03-28HouseRead first time
2019-03-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-25SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-25SenateRecord vote
2019-03-25SenatePassed
2019-03-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-25SenateRecord vote
2019-03-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-03-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-25SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-20SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-03-04SenateFiled
2019-03-04SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB9 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback