TX HB9 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-8)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Placed on Major State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the contributions to and benefits under the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the contributions to and benefits under the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2019-03-05HouseRead first time
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB12 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Postponed 4/25/19 10:00 AM

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback