TX SB1196 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to guardianships and alternatives to guardianship for persons who have physical disabilities or who are incapacitated.
Title
Relating to guardianships and alternatives to guardianship for persons who have physical disabilities or who are incapacitated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-27 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Record vote | |
2011-05-27 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-27 | Read | |
2011-05-27 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-13 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2011-05-13 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-13 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2011-05-13 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-04 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2011-05-04 | Read first time | |
2011-05-03 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-03 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Passed | |
2011-05-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-03 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-03 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-26 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Filed | |
2011-03-04 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Disabilities, Persons with
GUARDIANS & WARDS
INCAPACITATED PERSONS
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
Courts--County & Statutory
Disabilities, Persons with
GUARDIANS & WARDS
INCAPACITATED PERSONS
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts