TX SB1151 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the protection of expressive activities at public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the protection of expressive activities at public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - FA1 Hughes (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-18HouseRead first time
2017-05-17HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-16SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-16SenateRecord vote
2017-05-16SenatePassed
2017-05-16SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-16SenateRecord vote
2017-05-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-15SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-15SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-11SenateRecord vote
2017-05-11SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-11SenateRecord vote
2017-05-11SenateAmended
2017-05-11SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-11SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-11SenateRecord vote
2017-05-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-11SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-10SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-09SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-05SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-05SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-26SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-03-09SenateRead first time
2017-02-28SenateFiled
2017-02-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback