TX SB1104 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the coordination of certain broadband projects by the Public Utility Commission of Texas.
Title
Relating to the coordination of certain broadband projects by the Public Utility Commission of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2422 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
BROADBAND NETWORKS
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Utilities
Utilities--Telecommunications
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Utilities
Utilities--Telecommunications
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1104 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01104I.htm |