TX SB110 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to eligibility for compensation of persons wrongfully imprisoned.
Title
Relating to eligibility for compensation of persons wrongfully imprisoned.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2013-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2012-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2012-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Tuition
WRONGFUL IMPRISONMENT
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Tuition
WRONGFUL IMPRISONMENT