TX SB1090 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain regulations adopted by governmental entities regarding land use restrictions and building products, materials, or methods used in the construction or renovation of residential or commercial buildings.
Title
Relating to certain regulations adopted by governmental entities regarding land use restrictions and building products, materials, or methods used in the construction or renovation of residential or commercial buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1500 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-14 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1500 |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed |
2021-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-19 | House | Corrected comm. rept. sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-19 | House | Corrected comm. report distributed |
2021-05-19 | House | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator |
2021-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-13 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2021-05-13 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB2200 (Same As) 2021-04-12 - Referred to Administration
SB2200 (Same As) 2021-04-12 - Referred to Administration
SB2200 (Same As) 2021-04-12 - Referred to Administration
Subjects
BUILDING CONSTRUCTION
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
LIGHTING
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
LIGHTING