TX SB1083 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-24 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-24 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to parental approval for a student's participation in human sexuality instruction in public schools.
Title
Relating to parental approval for a student's participation in human sexuality instruction in public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-05-24 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-19 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
PARENTAL CONSENT
SEX EDUCATION
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
PARENTAL CONSENT
SEX EDUCATION