TX SB1041 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the deadline by which the Texas Water Development Board is required to identify and designate brackish groundwater production zones for certain areas of the state.
Title
Relating to the deadline by which the Texas Water Development Board is required to identify and designate brackish groundwater production zones for certain areas of the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1361 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-31 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1361 |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-04-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1617 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Considered in Calendars
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Water--Rights
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Water--Rights