TX HB1617 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the deadline by which the Texas Water Development Board is required to identify and designate brackish groundwater production zones for certain areas of the state.
Title
Relating to the deadline by which the Texas Water Development Board is required to identify and designate brackish groundwater production zones for certain areas of the state.
Sponsors
Rep. Lyle Larson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1041 (Same As) 2019-05-31 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Water--Rights
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Water--Rights
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1617 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01617I.htm |