TX SB1014 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to The Woodlands Township.
Title
Relating to The Woodlands Township.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-27 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-27 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-16 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |