TX SB10 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-02 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-02 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to making appropriations for the legislature and legislative agencies.
Title
Relating to making appropriations for the legislature and legislative agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-07 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-02 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-08-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-08-29 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-08-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-08-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Filed |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Same As) 2021-08-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1 (Same As) 2021-08-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1 (Same As) 2021-08-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars