TX HB1 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 51-1)
Status: Introduced on August 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to making appropriations for the legislature and legislative agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to making appropriations for the legislature and legislative agencies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-08-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-08-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-08-24HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-08-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-08-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-08-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-08-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-08-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-08-19HouseReferred to Appropriations
2021-08-19HouseRead first time
2021-08-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB10 (Same As) 2021-09-02 - Co-author authorized
SB10 (Same As) 2021-09-02 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback