TX HR968 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Mary Lee Castetter for her 20 years of service with the Texas Association of Builders.
Title
Honoring Mary Lee Castetter for her 20 years of service with the Texas Association of Builders.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Darby [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - Adopted RV#2036 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#2036 |
2023-05-24 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-24 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2023-04-05 | House | Filed |