TX HR95 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending members of the Bedford Fire Department for rendering aid to Louisianans in the wake of Hurricane Ida.
Title
Commending members of the Bedford Fire Department for rendering aid to Louisianans in the wake of Hurricane Ida.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Cason [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-10-14 | House | Adopted |
2021-10-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-10-14 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-10-13 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-10-11 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-10-11 | House | Filed |