TX HR885 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing March 19, 2019, as Port Aransas Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing March 19, 2019, as Port Aransas Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-19 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PORT ARANSAS DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates