TX HR88 | 2011 | 82nd Legislature 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Alda Santana for her service as senior legislative assistant in the office of State Representative Eddie Rodriguez.
Title
Commending Alda Santana for her service as senior legislative assistant in the office of State Representative Eddie Rodriguez.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-06-28 | Adopted | |
2011-06-28 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-15 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-06-10 | Filed |