TX HR879 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 2019 Step by Step for Special Needs event in Eagle Pass.
Title
Commemorating the 2019 Step by Step for Special Needs event in Eagle Pass.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-26 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-26 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed |