TX HR82 | 2011 | 82nd Legislature 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Cruz Garza, Jr., on his retirement from Rio Grande City High School.
Title
Congratulating Cruz Garza, Jr., on his retirement from Rio Grande City High School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-06-28 | Adopted | |
2011-06-28 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-15 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-06-10 | Filed |