TX HR77 | 2023 | 88th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Mary Kay Walker of Flower Mound on her retirement as president of the Seniors in Motion Auxiliary.
Title
Honoring Mary Kay Walker of Flower Mound on her retirement as president of the Seniors in Motion Auxiliary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-02 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-11-01 | House | Adopted |
2023-11-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-10-30 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-10-23 | House | Filed |