TX HR748 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Texas Joint Crime Information Center, Emily Robertson, and David Jackson for receiving awards from the National Fusion Center Association.
Title
Congratulating the Texas Joint Crime Information Center, Emily Robertson, and David Jackson for receiving awards from the National Fusion Center Association.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-03-05 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
JACKSON, DAVID
JOINT CRIME INFORMATION CENTER, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
ROBERTSON, EMILY
JOINT CRIME INFORMATION CENTER, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
ROBERTSON, EMILY