TX HR645 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Micah Pinson of Shady Shores on his selection as one of the top two youth volunteers in Texas by the Prudential Spirit of Community Awards program.
Title
Congratulating Micah Pinson of Shady Shores on his selection as one of the top two youth volunteers in Texas by the Prudential Spirit of Community Awards program.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-09 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-09 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-03-07 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |