TX HR633 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-18 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-18 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Recognizing Felix Fraga for his many contributions to the Houston community and to Houston Community College.
Title
Recognizing Felix Fraga for his many contributions to the Houston community and to Houston Community College.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-03-12 | Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | Laid before the House | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-03-10 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-03-05 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-03-03 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-02-25 | Filed |