TX HR62 | 2023 | 88th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Sujana Ganganamani on taking part in the 2023 National Rural Electric Cooperative Association Government-in-Action Youth Tour.
Title
Congratulating Sujana Ganganamani on taking part in the 2023 National Rural Electric Cooperative Association Government-in-Action Youth Tour.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-02 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-11-01 | House | Adopted |
2023-11-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-10-23 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-10-19 | House | Filed |