TX HR534 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Girl Scouts of Southwest Texas for enriching the lives of many young Texans.
Title
Commending Girl Scouts of Southwest Texas for enriching the lives of many young Texans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-02 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-02 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-03-02 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-02-28 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-02-20 | House | Filed |