TX HR452 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating February 2017 as Black History Month.
Title
Commemorating February 2017 as Black History Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BLACK HISTORY MONTH
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates