TX HR42 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the opening of Catherine Bethke Elementary School in the Katy Independent School District.
Title
Commemorating the opening of Catherine Bethke Elementary School in the Katy Independent School District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-02-23 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-23 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-01-03 | House | Filed |