TX HR300 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring the life of Cesar E. Chavez on March 31, 2009, the 82nd anniversary of his birth.
Title
Honoring the life of Cesar E. Chavez on March 31, 2009, the 82nd anniversary of his birth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-16 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-02-26 | Adopted | |
2009-02-26 | Laid before the House | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-02-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-02-06 | Filed |