TX HR2910 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Superintendent Michael Brown on his retirement from Highland Park Independent School District in Amarillo.
Title
Congratulating Superintendent Michael Brown on his retirement from Highland Park Independent School District in Amarillo.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-30 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-28 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-05-27 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-05-17 | House | Filed |