TX HR2684 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Herchel and Ora Lee Gamble of Lorena on their 65th wedding anniversary.
Title
Congratulating Herchel and Ora Lee Gamble of Lorena on their 65th wedding anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-21 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-05-15 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-05-11 | House | Filed |