TX HR24 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Major General Robert J. Bodisch on his retirement as commanding general of the Texas State Guard.
Title
Congratulating Major General Robert J. Bodisch on his retirement as commanding general of the Texas State Guard.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-09-30 | House | Adopted |
2021-09-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-09-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-09-27 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-09-27 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-09-23 | House | Filed |