TX HR2355 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Hilda Gloria Tagle on her retirement as senior judge of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas.
Title
Congratulating Hilda Gloria Tagle on her retirement as senior judge of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-29 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-05-26 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-05-25 | House | Filed |