TX HR2209 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Grayland Arnold of Kountze High School on being named the 2015 Super Gold Basketball MVP by the Beaumont Enterprise.
Title
Congratulating Grayland Arnold of Kountze High School on being named the 2015 Super Gold Basketball MVP by the Beaumont Enterprise.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-21 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-21 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-04-22 | House | Filed |