TX HR210 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Camila Hernandez of Ronald Reagan High School in San Antonio on excelling at the Educators Rising 2021 National Conference.
Title
Congratulating Camila Hernandez of Ronald Reagan High School in San Antonio on excelling at the Educators Rising 2021 National Conference.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-10-18 | House | Adopted |
2021-10-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-10-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-10-15 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-10-14 | House | Filed |