TX HR2015 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating mariachi singer Sebastien De La Cruz of San Antonio on his accomplishments.
Title
Congratulating mariachi singer Sebastien De La Cruz of San Antonio on his accomplishments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-23 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-09 | House | Filed |